NJ SJR57 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-14 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-4.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-14 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-4.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April 14th of each year as "Sikh Day."
Title
Designates April 14th of each year as "Sikh Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR94 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-4. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR94 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
AJR94 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by SJR57