NJ SJR56 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-14-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes 70th anniversary of establishment of State of Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes 70th anniversary of establishment of State of Israel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR63 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, JR-5.
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for AJR63 (1R)
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-02-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR63 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by SJR56

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback