NJ SJR17 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR49
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February 14 of each year as "Socks for the Homeless Day."
Title
Designates February 14 of each year as "Socks for the Homeless Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR51 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, JR-1. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR51 |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR17 (Carry Over) 2018-02-21 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-1.
AJR51 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Substituted by SJR17
AJR51 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Substituted by SJR17