NJ SJR118 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by AJR221 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by AJR221 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates July 5 of each year as Larry Doby Day.
Title
Designates July 5 of each year as Larry Doby Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by AJR221 (1R) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR221 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Approved P.L.2023, JR-11.