NJ SCR17 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR11
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR18
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR206
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR18
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Constitution to prohibit construction of new fossil fuel power plants.
Title
Amends Constitution to prohibit construction of new fossil fuel power plants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR17 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR18 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR206 (Carry Over) 2020-12-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR118 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SCR18 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR206 (Carry Over) 2020-12-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
ACR118 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SCR17 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SCR/17_I1.HTM |