NJ S985 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.223.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.223.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that public institutions of higher education may only reduce student's institutional financial aid upon receipt of private scholarship under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides that public institutions of higher education may only reduce student's institutional financial aid upon receipt of private scholarship under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3789 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3789 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.223. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A3789 |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3789 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S985