NJ S388 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2487
Note: Carry Over of previous A4033
Note: Carry Over of previous S985
Note: Carry Over of previous A1033
Note: Carry Over of previous A4033
Note: Carry Over of previous S985
Note: Carry Over of previous A1033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Burial Assistance Program;" appropriates $20 million.
Title
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Burial Assistance Program;" appropriates $20 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2487 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4033 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S985 (Carry Over) 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.223.
A1033 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4033 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S985 (Carry Over) 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.223.
A1033 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S388 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/388_I1.HTM |