NJ S978 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4773

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Approved P.L.2016, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2510 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2016, c.7.
2016-05-26AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-2-4)
2016-05-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2016-05-26SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2016-05-09Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0)
2016-05-02SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2016-03-14AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-13-9)
2016-03-14AssemblySubstituted for A2510
2016-03-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2016-02-11SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2016-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2510 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S978
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback