NJ A2510 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4773
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S978
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S978
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.
Title
Prohibits possession and transport of parts and products of certain animals at PANYNJ airports and port facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S978 |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S978 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - Approved P.L.2016, c.7.
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4773 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session