NJ S974 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1209

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.247.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for registration and accreditation of human milk banks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for registration and accreditation of human milk banks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1442 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.247.
2017-12-07AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted for A1442 (ACS)
2017-11-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-02-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2017-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-01-23SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Weinberg)
2016-11-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1209 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1442 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S974 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback