NJ A1442 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1858

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S974 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for registration and accreditation of human milk banks.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for registration and accreditation of human milk banks.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted by S974 (1R)
2017-11-30AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1858 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S974 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.247.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback