NJ S972 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3219
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Child Advocacy Center-Multidisciplinary Team Advisory Board and certification program for child advocacy centers and multidisciplinary teams; appropriates $10 million.
Title
Establishes Child Advocacy Center-Multidisciplinary Team Advisory Board and certification program for child advocacy centers and multidisciplinary teams; appropriates $10 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1788 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1788 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.90. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-09-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-14-6) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A1788 |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3219 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1788 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S972
A1788 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S972