NJ S90 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1949
Note: Carry Over of previous A3641
Note: Carry Over of previous A3641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates month of November as "Reflex Sympathetic Dystrophy Syndrome Awareness Month" in NJ.
Title
Designates month of November as "Reflex Sympathetic Dystrophy Syndrome Awareness Month" in NJ.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1949 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3641 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4247 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3641 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4247 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S90 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S0500/90_I1.HTM |