NJ A4247 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1949
Note: Carry Over of previous A3641
Note: Carry Over of previous A3641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates month of November as "Reflex Sympathetic Dystrophy Syndrome Awareness Month" in NJ.
Title
Designates month of November as "Reflex Sympathetic Dystrophy Syndrome Awareness Month" in NJ.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S90 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1949 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3641 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1949 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3641 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4247 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4247_I1.HTM |