NJ S891 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4240
Note: Carry Over of previous S54
Note: Carry Over of previous A5061
Note: Carry Over of previous S54
Note: Carry Over of previous A5061
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits tax preparers from engaging in certain practices involving refund anticipation checks and loans.
Title
Prohibits tax preparers from engaging in certain practices involving refund anticipation checks and loans.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1557 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1557 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.90. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-1-0) |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A1557 (2R) |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4240 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1557 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by S891 (1R)
S54 (Carry Over) 2021-01-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5061 (Carry Over) 2020-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1557 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by S891 (1R)
S54 (Carry Over) 2021-01-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5061 (Carry Over) 2020-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee