NJ S86 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2983

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Approved P.L.2016, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Class Three special law enforcement officers to provide security in public and nonpublic schools and county colleges.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Class Three special law enforcement officers to provide security in public and nonpublic schools and county colleges.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3629 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateApproved P.L.2016, c.68.
2016-11-21SenatePassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2016-10-20SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2016-10-20AssemblyPassed by the Senate (36-0)
2016-09-15Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (36-0)
2016-09-08AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2016-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2016-06-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2016-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-1-1)
2016-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A3629 (1R)
2016-06-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2016-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2016-02-11SenateSenate Amendment (34-0) (Bucco)
2016-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1244 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2983 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3629 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S86 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback