NJ A3629 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2983
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S86 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S86 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Class Three special law enforcement officers to provide security in public and nonpublic schools and county colleges.
Title
Establishes Class Three special law enforcement officers to provide security in public and nonpublic schools and county colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S86 (3R) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S86 (Same As) 2016-11-30 - Approved P.L.2016, c.68.
S2983 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2983 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee