NJ S854 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"Laura Wooten's Law"; Requires civics instruction in middle school; authorizes New Jersey Center for Civic Education to provide curricula, professional development and technical assistance for middle and high school civics.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Laura Wooten's Law"; Requires civics instruction in middle school; authorizes New Jersey Center for Civic Education to provide curricula, professional development and technical assistance for middle and high school civics.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3394 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback