NJ A3394 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S854/237 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S854/237 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Laura Wooten's Law"; Requires civics instruction in middle school; authorizes New Jersey Center for Civic Education to provide curricula, professional development and technical assistance for middle and high school civics.
Title
"Laura Wooten's Law"; Requires civics instruction in middle school; authorizes New Jersey Center for Civic Education to provide curricula, professional development and technical assistance for middle and high school civics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S854/237 (SCS) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S854 (Same As) 2021-07-23 - Approved P.L.2021, c.185.
S237 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Combined with S854 (SCS)
S237 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Combined with S854 (SCS)