NJ S844 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1072

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1980 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.126.
2019-06-10AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2018-10-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-09-27Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2018-08-27SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2018-06-21AssemblySubstituted for A1980
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-17AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-22SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1072 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1980 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S844

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback