NJ S1072 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - For Preliminary Committee Action - to be Reported Preliminiary - To be reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-20SenateFor Preliminary Committee Action - to be Reported Preliminiary - To be reported
2016-05-16SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-05-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1770 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
A1131 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback