NJ A1131 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1980
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.
Title
Establishes a partial return to work TDI program.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1131 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1770 (1R)
S1072 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1770 (1R)
S1072 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee