NJ S791 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1371
Note: Carry Foward to future A3144
Note: Carry Over of previous S760
Note: Carry Foward to future A3144
Note: Carry Over of previous S760
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires undergraduate students to file degree plan and requires institutions of higher education and certain propriety institutions to develop pathway systems to graduation.
Title
Requires undergraduate students to file degree plan and requires institutions of higher education and certain propriety institutions to develop pathway systems to graduation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S791 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham)
S791 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham)
S760 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3582 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S791 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham)
S760 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3582 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee