NJ S731 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3510

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates operation of low-speed electric bicycles and low-speed electric scooters.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates operation of low-speed electric bicycles and low-speed electric scooters.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1810 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.121.
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-1)
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted for A1810 (2R)
2019-01-31AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (35-2)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3510 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1810 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S731 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback