NJ S691 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3686
Note: Carry Over of previous A1060
Note: Carry Over of previous A1060
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns licensure of persons rendering barbering services in another state or foreign country.
Title
Concerns licensure of persons rendering barbering services in another state or foreign country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3686 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1060 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A2903 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1060 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A2903 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading