NJ A1060 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2903
Note: Carry Foward to future S691
Note: Carry Over of previous A1256

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns licensure of persons rendering barbering services in another state or foreign country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns licensure of persons rendering barbering services in another state or foreign country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-21SenateSenate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
2023-12-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-02-28SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2023-02-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2023-02-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-01-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1060 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1060 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1256 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3686 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback