NJ S690 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A115
Note: Carry Foward to future S804
Note: Carry Over of previous S4100
Note: Carry Over of previous A6111
Note: Carry Foward to future S804
Note: Carry Over of previous S4100
Note: Carry Over of previous A6111
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Disability Savings Act."
Title
"New Jersey Disability Savings Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S690 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S690 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4100 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A6111 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2043 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S690 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4100 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A6111 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2043 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee