NJ A2043 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A115
Note: Carry Foward to future S804
Note: Carry Over of previous A6111
Note: Carry Over of previous S4100
Note: Carry Foward to future S804
Note: Carry Over of previous A6111
Note: Carry Over of previous S4100
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Disability Savings Act."
Title
"New Jersey Disability Savings Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Voice) (Benson) |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2043 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2043 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A6111 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S4100 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S690 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2043 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A6111 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S4100 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S690 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee