NJ S678 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2055
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.183.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.183.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local government units to certify compliance with certain federal hiring requirements when filing annual budgets.
Title
Requires local government units to certify compliance with certain federal hiring requirements when filing annual budgets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4967 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.183. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-18-2) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A4967 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2055 (Carry Over) 2014-05-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4967 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S678
A4967 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S678