NJ A4967 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2055
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local government units to certify compliance with certain federal hiring requirements when filing annual budgets.
Title
Requires local government units to certify compliance with certain federal hiring requirements when filing annual budgets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S678 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S678 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.183.
S2055 (Carry Over) 2014-05-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2055 (Carry Over) 2014-05-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee