NJ S647 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1951

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises cybersecurity, asset management, and related reporting requirements in "Water Quality Accountability Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises cybersecurity, asset management, and related reporting requirements in "Water Quality Accountability Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4825 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2021-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2021-05-20AssemblySubstituted for A4825 (2R)
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee
2020-09-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2020-07-30SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Greenstein)
2020-06-15SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Greenstein)
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateTransferred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1951 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4825 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S647 (SCS/4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback