NJ A4825 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1951

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises cybersecurity, asset management, and related reporting requirements in "Water Quality Accountability Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises cybersecurity, asset management, and related reporting requirements in "Water Quality Accountability Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee
2020-10-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S647 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1951 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback