NJ S602 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3050
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey International Arbitration, Mediation, and Conciliation Act."
Title
"New Jersey International Arbitration, Mediation, and Conciliation Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1138 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.1. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A1138 (1R) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3050 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1138 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S602 (1R)
A1138 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S602 (1R)