NJ A1138 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4829
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S602 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S602 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey International Arbitration, Mediation, and Conciliation Act."
Title
"New Jersey International Arbitration, Mediation, and Conciliation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S602 (1R) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4829 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S602 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.1.
S602 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.1.