NJ S602 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S359
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises minimum age for purchase and sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices from 19 to 21.
Title
Raises minimum age for purchase and sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices from 19 to 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3254 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-21-5) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A3254 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-10) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3254 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S602
A3254 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S602
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S602 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S1000/602_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S602 |