NJ S359 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S602
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Raises minimum age for purchase and sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices from 19 to 21.
Title
Raises minimum age for purchase and sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices from 19 to 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2320 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.118. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-17-6) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A2320 |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2320 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S359
A2320 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S359