NJ S589 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.382.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Secretary of State to establish secure Internet website for online voter registration; authorizes use of digitized signatures from New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission's database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Secretary of State to establish secure Internet website for online voter registration; authorizes use of digitized signatures from New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission's database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A422 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.382.
2020-01-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-10)
2020-01-13SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (61-14-2)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A422 (ACS)
2020-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-06AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (23-15)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1403 (Carry Over) 2016-04-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A422 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S589 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback