NJ S1403 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2328

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Secretary of State to establish secure Internet website for online voter registration; authorizes use of digitized signatures from New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission's database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Secretary of State to establish secure Internet website for online voter registration; authorizes use of digitized signatures from New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission's database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-03-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2816 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2328 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback