NJ S515 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits physicians and veterinarians to earn continuing education credits by providing certain free medical or veterinary services.
Title
Permits physicians and veterinarians to earn continuing education credits by providing certain free medical or veterinary services.
Sponsors
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Approved P.L.2010, c.89. | |
2010-11-22 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-1-1) | |
2010-10-07 | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-08-23 | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (36-1) | |
2010-07-08 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-2) | |
2010-05-20 | Substituted for A928 | |
2010-05-06 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Passed by the Senate (37-2) | |
2010-02-04 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-01 | Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A928 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Substituted by S515