NJ S5 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3040

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.55.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3671 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.55.
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-1-5)
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2018-06-07Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2018-05-10SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-03-26AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-2-7)
2018-03-26AssemblyMotion To Table (Sumter) (50-21-0)
2018-03-26AssemblyMotion To Aa (Thomson)
2018-03-26AssemblySubstituted for A3671
2018-03-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (34-2)
2018-03-26SenateEmergency Resolution (34-2) (Kean)
2018-03-26SenateSenate Amendment (33-1) (Sweeney)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3040 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3671 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by S5 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback