NJ A3671 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3040

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Substituted by S5 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers management of PFRS to Board of Trustees of PFRS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26AssemblySubstituted by S5 (2R)
2018-03-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-22AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S5 (Same As) 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.55.
S3040 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback