NJ S499 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3529

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.246.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for improved system for eligibility determination for Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for improved system for eligibility determination for Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4569 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.246.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4569
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-11AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-09-27SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Vitale)
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3529 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4569 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S499 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback