NJ A4569 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3529
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S499 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S499 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for improved system for eligibility determination for Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.
Title
Provides for improved system for eligibility determination for Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S499 (2R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S499 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.246.
S3529 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3529 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee