NJ S452 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S394
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires waiver of dealer obligation regarding necessary repairs impacting vehicle inspection to include description of known defects.*
Title
Requires waiver of dealer obligation regarding necessary repairs impacting vehicle inspection to include description of known defects.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A838 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.182. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-6-2) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A838 (1R) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S394 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A838 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S452 (1R)
A838 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S452 (1R)