NJ S394 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S452
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits purchaser of used motor vehicle from waiving dealer's obligation regarding emissions control equipment.
Title
Prohibits purchaser of used motor vehicle from waiving dealer's obligation regarding emissions control equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4246 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4246 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4246 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (58-14-1) |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A4246 |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S394 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A4246 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S394 (1R)
A4246 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S394 (1R)