NJ S427 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2528
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-13)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Approved P.L.2018, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-13)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Approved P.L.2018, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Title
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A865 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.42. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-0-12) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A865 |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-5) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2528 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
A865 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S427
A865 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S427