NJ S2528 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S427
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Title
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3091 (1R) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2528 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
A3091 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3091 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly