NJ A3091 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A865
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-9)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Title
Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2528 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-5) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2528 (1R) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-0-7) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3091 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2528 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
S2528 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)