NJ S4265 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.290.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.290.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various revisions to alcoholic beverage manufacturing and retailing license laws.
Title
Makes various revisions to alcoholic beverage manufacturing and retailing license laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5912 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5912 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.290. |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-2) |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5912 |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5912 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S4265 (1R)