NJ S4201 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S296
Note: Carry Foward to future A1278
Note: Carry Foward to future A1278
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates periodic cancer screening examinations for firefighters enrolled in SHBP.
Title
Mandates periodic cancer screening examinations for firefighters enrolled in SHBP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A6093 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4201 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
S4201 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
A6093 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.
S4201 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6093 (1R)
A6093 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.478.